Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Mahfouz Ii, Richard L, Esq., against Diaz, Daniel, Jr, represented by Fadavi, Jahan S, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Sandhu, Sonny S. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management124 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage: Limited $10,000 - $25,000 |
Time To Trial924 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
|
This complaint is filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company against Daniel Diaz Jr and Does 1-40. The complaint is for subrogation recovery and the amount of damages claimed is $17,624.33. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company ...
Complaint
Date: February 27, 2019Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: February 26, 2020Court's Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 13, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: May 27, 2020Answer/General Denial
Date: November 20, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: April 15, 2020Minute Order- Reassignment
Date: January 14, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: February 26, 2020Separate Statement
Date: February 26, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: June 08, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Case Management Conference Jury Trial Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Case Management Conference Settlement Conference Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Case Management Conference Case Management Conference Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Ordered/Referred to Settlement Conference | |
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Statement Case Management Conference Statement |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Statement Case Management Conference Statement |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER-Case Management Conference Case Management Conference Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Statement Case Management Conference Statement |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Statement Case Management Conference Statement |
|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Court's Motion to Dismiss Case Management Conference Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.