Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Suttell &Amp; Hammer Apc, against Chayee Lee, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Silveira, Marie Sovey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2018 |
Category3.740 Collections: Limited $10,000 - $25,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Discover Bank against Chayee Lee in the Superior Court of California, County of Stanislaus. The complaint alleges that Chayee Lee is a natural person residing in the judicial district and owes Discover Bank...
Judgment by Default by Clerk
Date: June 20, 2019Declaration Re: Copies in Lieu of Originals
Date: June 20, 2019Request for Entry of Default - Entered
Date: June 20, 2019Judgment by Default by Clerk
Date: June 20, 2019Declaration
Date: June 20, 2019Declaration of Non Service
Date: March 04, 2019Proof of Service of Summons - Substituted Service
Date: March 14, 2019Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033
Date: June 20, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet - Plaintiff(s)
Date: December 10, 2018Declaration Regarding Non-Military Status
Date: June 20, 2019Declaration of Non Service
Date: February 27, 2019Declaration of Non Service
Date: February 01, 2019Civil Complaint
Date: December 10, 2018Summons Issued / Filed
Date: December 10, 2018Case Management Conference Waiver
Date: December 10, 2018Statement of Venue
Date: December 10, 2018Declaration for Default Judgment
Date: June 20, 2019Statement of Venue
Date: December 10, 2018Civil Complaint
Date: December 10, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Silveira, Marie Sovey |
|
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment/Order Judgment by Default by Clerk |
|
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Copies in Lieu of Originals | |
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default - Entered | |
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk | |
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033 | |
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non-Military Status | |
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default Judgment | |
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non-Military Status |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.