Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Capital Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Salet, Keri L, Esq., Hunt &Amp; Henriques, against Kelli S Beyer, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Speiller, Stacy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2018 |
Category3.740 Collections: Limited $10,000 - $25,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. against Kelli S Beyer in the Superior Court of California, County of Stanislaus. The complaint is related to a contract dispute. The jurisdiction of the case is an unlimited civ...
Request for Dismissal - Entire Action
Date: June 12, 2019Civil Complaint
Date: July 27, 2018Request for Dismissal - Entire Action
Date: June 12, 2019Declaration of Non Service
Date: October 31, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet - Plaintiff(s)
Date: July 27, 2018Civil Complaint
Date: July 27, 2018Summons Issued / Filed
Date: July 27, 2018Declaration of Non Service
Date: October 03, 2018Case Management Conference Waiver
Date: July 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
MO RESETTING HRNG Court Trial Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non Service | |
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non Service | |
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non Service | |
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Due Diligence Declaration of Non Service |
|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Complaint | |
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet - Plaintiff(s) | |
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.