Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Good Post, Llc, A California Limited Liability, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Ver, Aaron J., against Barcelino Continental Corp, Barcelino Continental Corp., A California, Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, represented by Johnson, Eric B., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Charles F. Haines presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 03, 2023 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Commercial |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a proof of service document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The plaintiff, Good Post, LLC, is suing the defendant, Barcelino Continental Corp., for unlawful detainer. The document states that the ...
SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF GOOD POST, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
Date: April 04, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2024 | Hearing |
Judge: CHARLES F. HAINES |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SHAREI (TRANSACTION ID # 210076436) FILED BY DEFENDANT BARCELINO CONTINENTAL CORP | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS FILED BY DEFENDANT BARCELINO CONTINENTAL CORP | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | . (TRANSACTION ID # 210076436) FILED BY DEFENDANT BARCELINO CONTINENTAL CORP HEARING SET FOR JUL-12-2024 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ERIC JOHNSON (TRANSACTION ID # 210076436) FILED BY DEFENDANT BARCELINO CONTINENTAL CORP | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 21007436) FILED BY DEFENDANT BARCELINO CONTINENTAL CORP | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF VER, AARON J. ON NOV-16-2023 THROUGH NOV-28-2023 (TRANSACTION ID # 100218393) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOOD POST, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY | |
June 16, 2023 | Hearing |
MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS OF CASE(S) CGC-23-604803 WITH CASE CUD-23-671595
Judge: CHARLES F. HAINES |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-16-2023 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501 | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | REAL PROPERTY/HOUSING MOTION 501, DEFENDANT BARCELINO CONTINENTAL CORP'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS OF CASE(S) CGC-23-604803 WITH CASE CUD-23-671595 IS DENIED. PREVAILING PARTY TO PREPARE ORDER IN COMPLIANCE WITH CRC 3.1312(B). JUDGE: CHARLES F. HAINES; CLERK: KENNETH B. HUNT; NOT REPORTED. (D501) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.