Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Backyard Industries, Llc,, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Azad, Alexandra, Klein, Ashley E., against Does 1-10, Inclusive, Tillman, John, represented by Mouton, Abel, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarrett L. Wong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2023 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint document is a proof of service of summons in a legal case. It is filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The plaintiff/petitioner is BACKYARD INDUSTRIES, LLC, a California limited liability company, and the ...
EXHIBIT LIST (TRANSACTION ID # 70103529) FILED BY DEFENDANT TILLMAN, JOHN
Date: May 30, 2023NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: February 23, 2023ORDER FOR STAY OF EXECUTION STAYED UNTIL APR-11-2023
Date: April 04, 2023ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 69790908) FILED BY DEFENDANT TILLMAN, JOHN
Date: April 11, 2023MINUTES FOR MAY-30-2023 1:30 PM
Date: May 30, 2023ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: April 26, 2023RETURN OF, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED
Date: April 24, 2023TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 70103529) FILED BY DEFENDANT TILLMAN, JOHN
Date: May 30, 2023WITNESS LIST (TRANSACTION ID # 70103529) FILED BY DEFENDANT TILLMAN, JOHN
Date: May 30, 2023MINUTES FOR MAY-31-2023 9:30 AM
Date: May 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 70362263): AZAD, ALEXANDRA, KLEIN, ASHLEY E. SUBSTITUTED FOR AZAD, ALEXANDRA AS ATTORNEY FOR BACKYARD INDUSTRIES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIAIBLITY COMPANY | |
May 31, 2023 | Hearing |
JURY TRIAL
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | MINUTES FOR MAY-31-2023 9:30 AM | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM JURY TRIAL CALENDAR SET FOR MAY-31-2023 - CASE SETTLED. JUDGE: GARRETT L. WONG, CLERK: K. SEPTIEN, NOT REPORTED, (504). | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT LIST (TRANSACTION ID # 70103529) FILED BY DEFENDANT TILLMAN, JOHN | |
May 30, 2023 | Hearing |
JURY TRIAL
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
May 30, 2023 | Hearing |
UD JURY TRIALS
Judge: CHARLES F. HAINES |
|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 70103569) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BACKYARD INDUSTRIES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIAIBLITY COMPANY | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | MINUTES FOR MAY-30-2023 1:30 PM | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 70103529) FILED BY DEFENDANT TILLMAN, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.