Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
City & County Of San Francisco Operating By &, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Wilkinson, Phillip H.C., against Aclima, Inc. 10 Lombard Street, Roundhouse Two, Third Floor San Francisco, Ca 94111, Davida Herzl, Does 1-50, Matt Hill, represented by Epstein, Mark D, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 15, 2022 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67521492) FILED BY DEFENDANT ACLIMA, INC.
Date: April 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67521492) FILED BY DEFENDANT ACLIMA, INC. | |
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER (TRANSACTION ID # 67521492) FILED BY DEFENDANT ACLIMA, INC. | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (TRANSACTION ID # 67495260) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITY & COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO OPERATING BY & THROUGH THE SAN FRANCISCO PORT COMMISSION | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67495260) AS TO DEFENDANT DAVIDA HERZL (CEO) MATT HILL (CFO) | |
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, E-FILING REJECT, (TRANSACTION ID # 67481602) SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF CITY & COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO OPERATING BY & THROUGH THE SAN FRANCISCO PORT COMMISSION AS TO DEFENDANT ACLIMA, INC. | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ; PLAINTIFF'S MANDATORY COVER SHEET AND SUPPLEMENTAL ALLEGATIONS-UD, (TRANSACTION ID # 67443560), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITY & COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO OPERATING BY & THROUGH THE SAN FRANCISCO PORT COMMISSION SERVED MAR-23-2022, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE MAR-25-2022 AS TO DEFENDANT MATT HILL (CFO) | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ; PLAINTIFF'S MANDATORY COVER SHEET AND SUPPLEMENTAL ALLEGATIONS-UD, (TRANSACTION ID # 67443560), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITY & COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO OPERATING BY & THROUGH THE SAN FRANCISCO PORT COMMISSION SERVED MAR-23-2022, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE MAR-25-2022 AS TO DEFENDANT ACLIMA, INC. | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ; PLAINTIFF'S MANDATORY COVER SHEET AND SUPPLEMENTAL ALLEGATIONS-UD, (TRANSACTION ID # 67443560), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITY & COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO OPERATING BY & THROUGH THE SAN FRANCISCO PORT COMMISSION SERVED MAR-23-2022, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE MAR-25-2022 AS TO DEFENDANT DAVIDA HERZL (CEO) | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | UNLAWFUL DETAINER COVER SHEET (COMMERCIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITY & COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO OPERATING BY & THROUGH THE SAN FRANCISCO PORT COMMISSION AS TO DEFENDANT ACLIMA, INC. DAVIDA HERZL (CEO) MATT HILL (CFO) DOES 1-50 | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMMERCIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITY & COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO OPERATING BY & THROUGH THE SAN FRANCISCO PORT COMMISSION AS TO DEFENDANT ACLIMA, INC. DAVIDA HERZL (CEO) MATT HILL (CFO) DOES 1-50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.