Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Gupner, Annette, Plotkowski, Michael, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Schivo, Ronald David, against Alexander,, Alexander, Jason, Awbrey,, Awbrey, Lisa, represented by Collier, Stephen Leonard, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Charles F. Haines presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 08, 2019 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions75 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time114 days |
This complaint is a surreply submitted by the plaintiffs, Michael Plotkowski and Annette Gupner, in response to the defendants' demurrer to the complaint. The plaintiffs argue that the defendants' citation to Hilaly v Allen does not support the tenan...
NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF COURT COSTS FILED BY DEFENDANT AWBREY, LISA ALEXANDER, JASON
Date: August 30, 2019REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER
Date: July 22, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY LISA AWBREY AND JASON ALEXANDER
Date: August 09, 2019POS RE: NTC OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT AWBREY, LISA ALEXANDER, JASON
Date: August 09, 2019ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE SURREPLY FOR DEMURRER
Date: July 22, 2019ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO RECLASSIFY
Date: June 26, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF COURT COSTS FILED BY DEFENDANT AWBREY, LISA ALEXANDER, JASON | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY LISA AWBREY AND JASON ALEXANDER | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | POS RE: NTC OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT AWBREY, LISA ALEXANDER, JASON | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $1,205.00 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE AUG-29-2019, FILED BY DEFENDANT AWBREY, LISA ALEXANDER, JASON | |
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF PLOTKOWSKI, MICHAEL GUPNER, ANNETTE TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT AWBREY, LISA ALEXANDER, JASON SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
July 26, 2019 | Hearing |
DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Judge: CHARLES F. HAINES |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT OFR UNLAWFUL DETAINER WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND | |
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY DEFENDANT AWBREY, LISA ALEXANDER, JASON | |
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | REAL PROPERTY/HOUSING MOTION 501, DEFENDANTS LISA AWBREY AND JASON ALEXANDER'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT IS SUSTAINED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. PLAINTIFF FAILED TO COMPLY WITH ELLIS ACT AND SFRO 37.9A(F)(1), (2) AND (4). ORDER IS SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS.) JUDGE: CHARLES F. HAINES, CLERK: S. LE, COURT REPORTER: DAVID DISBROW CSR #7768 (TEL: 415-298-1538 EMAIL: DAVID415D@YAHOO.COM). (D501) | |
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUL-26-2019 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.