Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gong, Peter, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Foran, David J, against Does 1 To 10, Does 1 To 10 1737-9Th Avenue #E San Francisco, Ca 94122, Nudelman, Matthew, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Ronald Evans Quidachay presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2018 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time58 days |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons and complaint in a legal case filed by Peter Gong against Matthew Nudelman and others. The case number is CUD-18-661994 and the filing date is June 13, 2018. The document indicates that copies of the su...
NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL
Date: June 14, 2018NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: May 23, 2018ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT NUDELMAN, MATTHEW
Date: June 07, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION AND SUPPORTING DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF GONG, PETER | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF GONG, PETER RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT NUDELMAN, MATTHEW THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: 1737 - 9TH AVENUE, #E, SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94122 $7,356.32 RENT, $800.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $60.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $8,216.32, (SEE SCANNED JUDGMENT FOR DETAILS) | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF PETER GONG ISO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF GONG, PETER | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS) | |
July 02, 2018 | Hearing |
UD COURT TRIALS
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GONG, PETER ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT NUDELMAN, MATTHEW | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM UD COURT TRIAL CALENDAR SET FOR JUL-02-2018 - CASE SETTLED PER TELEPHONE REPORT FROM PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, DAVID FORAN (501) | |
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 AS TO DEFENDANT NUDELMAN, MATTHEW | |
June 20, 2018 | Hearing |
REQUEST PENDING TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | MASTER MOTION CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2018 IN 206, HEARING ON APPLICANT/DEFENDANT MATTHEW NUDELMAN'S WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS. NO APPEARANCE BY APPLICANT. THE COURT BEING UNABLE TO EXAMINE APPLICANT RULED ON THE APPLICATION SUBMITTED. THE COURT GRANTED THE APPLICATION IN WHOLE. ORDER SIGNED, AND ENDORSED-FILED COPY MAILED TO APPLICANT. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; MATTER NOT REPORTED (206/TLJ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.