Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Yake, Cristina, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Bornstein, Daniel M, Quetel, Kathryn, against Does 1 To 10, Inclusive, Hypes, Irma, represented by Wolford, Jason N, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Ronald Evans Quidachay presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 12, 2016 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time61 days |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HYPES, IRMA
Date: September 22, 2016DEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY DEFENDANT HYPES, IRMA
Date: September 22, 2016ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS ;ENDORSED COPY RETURNED IN SASE.
Date: August 29, 2016NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: August 12, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2016 | Hearing |
UD JURY TRIALS
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
October 12, 2016 | Hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-12-2016 - CASE SETTLED. STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON FILE. JUDGE: SUZANNE R. BOLANOS, CLERK: M. GOODMAN, NOT REPORTED. (D501) | |
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM UD JURY CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-17-2016 - CASE SETTLED.(501) | |
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YAKE, CRISTINA ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT HYPES, IRMA | |
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL AND SETTLEMENT HEARING HEARING SET FOR OCT-12-2016 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 501 | |
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF YAKE, CRISTINA HEARING SET FOR OCT-17-2016 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 501 | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HYPES, IRMA | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY DEFENDANT HYPES, IRMA | |
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: BORNSTEIN, DANIEL M SUBSTITUTED FOR QUETEL, KATHRYN AS ATTORNEY FOR YAKE, CRISTINA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.