Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Geary Manor Apartments, Lp, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Wasserman, David, against Cazares, Hugo, Does 1 To 10, Inclusive, Reyes, Jose, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 01, 2016 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time51 days |
This complaint document is a proof of service of summons and complaint in a legal case between Geary Manor Apartments, LP and Hugo Cazares et al. The document includes information about the attorney representing Geary Manor Apartments, LP, David P. W...
NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: June 01, 2016SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF GEARY MANOR APARTMENTS, LP
Date: June 02, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, SATISFIED AS TO REAL PROPERTY ONLY AS TO DEFENDANT CAZARES, HUGO AN INDIVIDUAL REYES, JOSE AN INDIVIDUAL | |
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE , $34.97 FILED BY PLAINTIFF GEARY MANOR APARTMENTS, LP | |
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT CAZARES, HUGO AN INDIVIDUAL REYES, JOSE AN INDIVIDUAL | |
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GEARY MANOR APARTMENTS, LP SERVED JUN-03-2016, PRE-JUDGEMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE | |
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 1169 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF GEARY MANOR APARTMENTS, LP RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT CAZARES, HUGO AN INDIVIDUAL REYES, JOSE AN INDIVIDUAL THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: 776 GEARY STREET, APARTMENT 402A CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, STATE OF CALIFORNIA 94109, LEASE FORFEITED, **APPLIES TO ALL UNNAMED/UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.** | |
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT CAZARES, HUGO AN INDIVIDUAL REYES, JOSE AN INDIVIDUAL | |
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event | RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GEARY MANOR APARTMENTS, LP AS TO DEFENDANT CAZARES, HUGO AN INDIVIDUAL REYES, JOSE AN INDIVIDUAL | |
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DAVID P. WASSERMAN, ESQ. RE COPY OF LEASE AGREEMENT. FILED BY PLAINTIFF GEARY MANOR APARTMENTS, LP | |
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GEARY MANOR APARTMENTS, LP SERVED JUN-06-2016, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT CAZARES, HUGO AN INDIVIDUAL | |
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF GEARY MANOR APARTMENTS, LP AS TO DEFENDANT CAZARES, HUGO AN INDIVIDUAL REYES, JOSE AN INDIVIDUAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.