Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bernard Living Trust, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Matlin, Shauna, against Does 1 To 20, Lewis, Harrison, Ramos, Austin, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 04, 2016 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions28 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time66 days |
This complaint document is a proof of service of summons and complaint in a case between the Bernard Living Trust and Harrison Lewis et al. The case number is CUD-16-655080 and the filing date is April 18, 2016. The document indicates that the plaint...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, SATISFIED AS TO REAL PROPERTY ONLY AS TO DEFENDANT LEWIS, HARRISON RAMOS, AUSTIN | |
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT LEWIS, HARRISON RAMOS, AUSTIN | |
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE IN THE AMOUNT OF $71.66 FILED BY PLAINTIFF BERNARD LIVING TRUST | |
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 1169 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF BERNARD LIVING TRUST RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT LEWIS, HARRISON RAMOS, AUSTIN THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: 445 24TH AVENUE, #202, SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94121, COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, LEASE FORFEITED, ***INCLUDE ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES INTO THE JUDGMENT*** SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | RECEIVED REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BERNARD LIVING TRUST AS TO DEFENDANT LEWIS, HARRISON RAMOS, AUSTIN | |
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF UNAVAILABLE ORIGINAL LEASE AGREEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BERNARD LIVING TRUST | |
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF BERNARD LIVING TRUST AS TO DEFENDANT LEWIS, HARRISON RAMOS, AUSTIN | |
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 20 | |
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT LEWIS, HARRISON | |
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BERNARD LIVING TRUST AS TO DEFENDANT LEWIS, HARRISON RAMOS, AUSTIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.