Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Funghi, Luciano, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Brayer, Janet B, against Dias, Damique, Does 1-20, Saxton, Aaron, represented by Hansen, Ian A, Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Ronald Evans Quidachay presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time98 days |
ORDER WAIVING DEFENDANT'S PRESENCE AT SETTLEMENT HEARING
Date: May 25, 2016DEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY DEFENDANT SAXTON, AARON
Date: April 26, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE OF PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION
Date: March 02, 2016DEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY DEFENDANT DIAS, DAMIQUE
Date: March 02, 2016PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY DEFENDANT DIAS, DAMIQUE
Date: March 02, 2016NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: February 24, 2016ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DIAS, DAMIQUE
Date: March 02, 2016ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SAXTON, AARON
Date: April 26, 2016REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 20, 2016OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FUNGHI, LUCIANO
Date: May 24, 2016ORDER TO MAINTAIN RESTRICTED ACCESS TO THE RECORD
Date: May 26, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER RE: DEFENDANT SAXTON'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ; DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS OFF CALENDAR. ACTION REPORTED SETTLED ON MAY 26, 2016. | |
June 01, 2016 | Docket Event | REAL PROPERTY/HOUSING MOTION, 501, MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT /NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OFF CALENDAR ACTION REPORTED SETTLED ON MAY 26, 2016. ORDER IS SIGNED. (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS) | |
May 31, 2016 | Hearing |
UD JURY TRIALS
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
May 27, 2016 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM UD JURY CALENDAR SET FOR MAY-31-2016 - JUDGMENT ON FILE. (501) | |
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FUNGHI, LUCIANO ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT DIAS, DAMIQUE | |
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF FUNGHI, LUCIANO RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT SAXTON, AARON DIAS, DAMIQUE THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: 2865 25TH STREET, #3, SAN FRANCISCO, LEASE FORFEITED, SEE SCANNED DOC | |
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FUNGHI, LUCIANO ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT SAXTON, AARON | |
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER TO MAINTAIN RESTRICTED ACCESS TO THE RECORD | |
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL. $40 FILED BY PLAINTIFF FUNGHI, LUCIANO | |
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event | PAYMENT OF WAIVED FEES (MAR-02-2016 FIRST PAPER RESPONSE/PLEADING $2,500 - $10,000) (CONFIDENTIAL) PAID BY DEFENDANT DIAS, DAMIQUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.