Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Equity Growth Asset Management, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Marquez, Jak Steven, against Does, Does 1 Through 10, Giorgi, Alan, Parvahan, Sarvenaz, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Richard B. Ulmer, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time126 days |
NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: February 04, 2016REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: March 22, 2016OPPOSITION TO PLTF'S MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT PARVAHAN, SARVENAZ
Date: March 30, 2016NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: April 05, 2016ORDER OF THE COURT FOR STAY OF EXECUTION
Date: April 19, 2016ORDER PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 04, 2016ORDER FOR STAY OF EXECUTION STAYED UNTIL MAY-10-2016
Date: May 03, 2016EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR STAY FILED BY DEFENDANT PARVAHAN, SARVENAZ
Date: April 26, 2016ORDER FOR STAY OF EXECUTION STAYED UNTIL MAY-03-2016
Date: April 26, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, SATISFIED AS TO REAL PROPERTY ONLY AS TO DEFENDANT PARVAHAN, SARVENAZ GIORGI, ALAN | |
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $816.62 RE 34066 FOR TRANSACTION W2016510R006 (RENT DEPOSIT), PAYABLE TO EQUITY GROWTH ASSET, WARRANT #38204418, DATED MAY-31-2016 | |
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $816.66 RE 34049 FOR TRANSACTION W2016503R005 (RENT DEPOSIT), PAYABLE TO EQUITY GROWTH ASSET, WARRANT #38204418, DATED MAY-31-2016 | |
May 20, 2016 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $816.66 RE 34033 FOR TRANSACTION R6416426R012 (RENT DEPOSIT), PAYABLE TO EQUITY GROWTH ASSET MGMT, DOC #1907554501, WARRANT #38204377, DATED MAY-20-2016 | |
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR STAY FILED BY DEFENDANT PARVAHAN, SARVENAZ | |
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR STAY OF EXECUTION / ORDER OF THE COURT FOR STAY OF EXECUTION STAYED UNTIL MAY-17-2016 | |
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event | RENT DEPOSIT DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT PARVAHAN, SARVENAZ | |
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $816.66 RE 34014 FOR TRANSACTION W1616419R019 (RENT DEPOSIT), PAYABLE TO EQUITY GROWTH ASSET, DOC #1907541197, WARRANT #38204357, DATED MAY-06-2016 | |
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR STAY OF EXECUTION FILED BY DEFENDANT PARVAHAN, SARVENAZ | |
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR STAY OF EXECUTION STAYED UNTIL MAY-10-2016 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.