Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Eagle Vista Equities, Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Bornstein, Jonathan H, Jackson, Pamela Curulewski, against Does 1 To 10, Inclusive, Sorto, Ada, Sorto, Mario, represented by Balderama, Rudy, Pro Per, Wolford, Jason N, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Richard B. Ulmer, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 16, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions40 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time259 days |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons and complaint in a legal case between Eagle Vista Equities, LLC and Mario Sorto et al. The case number is CUD-15-653679 and was filed on May 5, 2016. The document includes the contact information for th...
DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF EAGLE VISTA EQUITIES, LLC
Date: February 26, 2016ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS: BORNSTEIN, JONATHAN H ADDED AS ATTORNEY FOR EAGLE VISTA EQUITIES, LLC
Date: November 24, 2015SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: BALDERAMA, RUDY SUBSTITUTED FOR PRO PER AS ATTORNEY FOR SORTO, MARIO
Date: November 10, 2015NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: October 16, 2015SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF EAGLE VISTA EQUITIES, LLC
Date: November 24, 2015SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: BALDERAMA, RUDY SUBSTITUTED FOR PRO PER AS ATTORNEY FOR SORTO, ADA
Date: November 10, 2015NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY DEFENDANT SORTO, MARIO SORTO, ADA
Date: December 02, 2015SUMMONS ISSUED ON SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT TO PLAINTIFF EAGLE VISTA EQUITIES, LLC
Date: March 15, 2016ORDER SUSTAINING DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)
Date: November 25, 2015ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR MOTION. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT.
Date: February 26, 2016ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)
Date: March 15, 2016OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER; EXHIBITS FILED BY PLAINTIFF EAGLE VISTA EQUITIES, LLC
Date: April 14, 2016ORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANT'S JOINT DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 28, 2016ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SORTO, MARIO SORTO, ADA
Date: May 03, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF EAGLE VISTA EQUITIES, LLC | |
June 20, 2016 | Hearing |
UD COURT TRIALS
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM UD COURT TRIAL CALENDAR SET FOR JUN-20-2016 - DISMISSAL ON FILE. (501) | |
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO WAIVE JURY FEES AND EXPENSES PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT SORTO, MARIO ORDER FOR WAIVER OF JURY FEES AND EXPENSES GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 | |
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO WAIVE JURY FEES AND EXPENSES PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT SORTO, ADA ORDER FOR WAIVER OF JURY FEES AND EXPENSES GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 | |
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event | CONVERTED TO COURT TRIAL, NO JURY FEE WAIVER OR JURY FEE DEPOSIT | |
June 15, 2016 | Hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-15-2016 01:30 PM FOR DEPT 501 | |
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event | SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD, CASE NOT SETTLED. THE TRIAL DATE OF JUNE 20, 2016 REMAINS ON CALENDAR. (501) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.