Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cp Iii Rincon Towers Inc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Myers, Lyra, against Bae, Soobeen, Does 1 To 10, Inclusive, Harakidas, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 23, 2015 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions371 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time434 days |
NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: April 23, 2015NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY MYERS, LYRA
Date: January 21, 2016DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE
Date: June 28, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CP III RINCON TOWERS INC RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT BAE, SOOBEEN HARAKIDAS, JOSEPH THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: POSSESSION NOT AT ISSUE $6,521.42 RENT, $530.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $7,051.42, LEASE FORFEITED, SEE SCANNED DOC | |
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT BAE, SOOBEEN HARAKIDAS, JOSEPH | |
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585D FILED BY PLAINTIFF CP III RINCON TOWERS INC | |
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE | |
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF CP III RINCON TOWERS INC AS TO DEFENDANT BAE, SOOBEEN HARAKIDAS, JOSEPH | |
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY MYERS, LYRA | |
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, SATISFIED AS TO REAL PROPERTY ONLY AS TO DEFENDANT BAE, SOOBEEN HARAKIDAS, JOSEPH | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT BAE, SOOBEEN HARAKIDAS, JOSEPH | |
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF UNAVAILABLE ORIGINAL LEASE AGREEMENT. FILED BY PLAINTIFF CP III RINCON TOWERS INC | |
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT BAE, SOOBEEN HARAKIDAS, JOSEPH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.