Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank,, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Richardson, Dess, against Chew, Larry, Does 1 To 20, Incl., represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Ksenia Tsenin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 21, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time120 days |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons and complaint in a legal case between JPMorgan Chase Bank and Larry Chew et al. The case number is CUD-12-642447 and the filing date is Sep-21-2012. The complaint is for an unlawful detainer and include...
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CHEW, LARRY
Date: August 29, 2012AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CHEW, LARRY
Date: October 18, 2012OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT CHEW, LARRY
Date: October 24, 2012NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: August 21, 2012ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT
Date: November 13, 2012ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE JUDGMENT
Date: November 05, 2012ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 25, 2012EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER STAY OF EXECUTION FILED BY DEFENDANT CHEW, LARRY
Date: November 27, 2012ORDER FOR STAY
Date: November 27, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $350.00 RE 31334 FOR TRANSACTION W2212B27R005 (RENT DEPOSIT), PAYABLE TO JPMORGAN CHASE, DOC #1904972267, WARRANT #38202481, DATED DEC-19-2012 | |
November 27, 2012 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER STAY OF EXECUTION FILED BY DEFENDANT CHEW, LARRY | |
November 27, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR STAY | |
November 27, 2012 | Docket Event | RENT DEPOSIT DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT CHEW, LARRY | |
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event | NTC OF RULING ON MTN TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION | |
November 13, 2012 | Tentative Ruling |
Mtn To Vacate Judgment Unlawful Detainer Law and Motion Calendar for Monday, November 13, 2012, line 7. DEFENDANT LARRY CHEW's Motion To Vacate Judgment. Defendant's Motion to Vacate Judgment is Off C...
Judge: KSENIA TSENIN |
|
November 13, 2012 | Hearing |
Mtn To Vacate Judgment
Judge: KSENIA TSENIN |
|
November 13, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT | |
November 13, 2012 | Docket Event | UNLAWFUL DETAINER MOTION, 501,DEFENDANT LARRY CHEW'S MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT IS DENIED. JUDGE KAY TSENIN, CLERK K. LIU, NOT REPORTED. | |
November 13, 2012 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR NOV-13-2012 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.