Case Last Refreshed: 30 minutes ago
San Francisco Housing Authority, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Palencia, Monelle, against Castellanos, Llysa, Does 1 To 10, Inclusive, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Ronald Evans Quidachay presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 08, 2012 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
Last RefreshedApril 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time1004 days |
NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: May 08, 2012ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CASTELLANOS, LLYSA
Date: May 17, 2012REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER
Date: January 22, 2015ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: January 26, 2015ORDER TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND RECALL WRIT OF EXECUTION
Date: February 06, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER PER STIPULATION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT CASTELLANOS, LLYSA | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND RECALL WRIT OF EXECUTION | |
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT CASTELLANOS, LLYSA THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: 1520 SUNNYDALE AVE. SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94134, LEASE FORFEITED, SEE SCANNED DOC | |
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY | |
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER | |
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY | |
June 25, 2012 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT CASTELLANOS, LLYSA | |
June 25, 2012 | Hearing |
UD JURY TRIALS
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.