Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Yee, Sheila, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Pro Per, against Bin, Mei, Chavez, Orlando, Does, Ferrera, Melvin, represented by Hairston, Amanda D, Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Ronald Evans Quidachay presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 10, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions16 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time65 days |
ORDER OF THE COURT FOR STAY OF EXECUTION
Date: May 08, 2012ORDER FOR STAY OF EXECUTION
Date: May 15, 2012NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: April 10, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT FERRERA, MELVIN (SUED AS "MEI BIN")
Date: May 17, 2012DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE $100.00 FILED BY PLAINTIFF YEE, SHEILA
Date: April 27, 2012PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY DEFENDANT CHAVEZ, ORLANDO
Date: April 26, 2012DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT CHAVEZ, ORLANDO
Date: May 17, 2012NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFT
Date: May 23, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2012 | Hearing |
DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
June 14, 2012 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $93.31 RE 30650 FOR TRANSACTION W1612515R016 (RENT DEPOSIT), PAYABLE TO SHEILA YEE, DOC #1904577028, WARRANT #38202090, DATED JUN-14-2012 | |
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT CHAVEZ, ORLANDO FERRERA, MELVIN (SUED AS "MEI BIN") | |
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event | UNLAWFUL DETAINER MOTION, 501, DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, OFF CALENDAR - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED. (501) | |
June 11, 2012 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $93.31 RE 30608 FOR TRANSACTION W2012508R009 (RENT DEPOSIT), PAYABLE TO SHEILA YEE, DOC #1904566309, WARRANT #38202083, DATED JUN-11-2012 | |
June 04, 2012 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT BIN, MEI | |
May 31, 2012 | Docket Event | RENT DEPOSIT, TRAN # W2012531R003, TAG # 030727 DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT FERRERA, MELVIN (SUED AS "MEI BIN") | |
May 31, 2012 | Docket Event | RENT DEPOSIT, TRAN # W2012531R002, TAG # 030726 DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT CHAVEZ, ORLANDO | |
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT FERRERA, MELVIN (SUED AS "MEI BIN") | |
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event | DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FERRERA, MELVIN (SUED AS "MEI BIN") HEARING SET FOR JUN-20-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.