Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Northridge Cooperative Homes, Inc., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Briggs, David John, against Berry, Vincent, Does 1 To 50, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 07, 2011 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time85 days |
ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT
Date: April 26, 2011NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: March 07, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 1169 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF NORTHRIDGE COOPERATIVE HOMES, INC. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT BERRY, VINCENT THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: 242 HARBOR ROAD, SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94124, LEASE FORFEITED, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT BERRY, VINCENT | |
May 02, 2011 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (PREJUDGMENT), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTHRIDGE COOPERATIVE HOMES, INC. SERVED APR-28-2011, POSTING AND MAILING AS TO DEFENDANT BERRY, VINCENT | |
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT | |
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTHRIDGE COOPERATIVE HOMES, INC. | |
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event | UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTHRIDGE COOPERATIVE HOMES, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT BERRY, VINCENT DOES 1 TO 50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED | |
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.