Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ethel H. Ross As Trustee Of The Ethel Hill Ross, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Beckman, Richard Lee, Hall, Michael Carrillo, against Bertrand, Claude Alix, Does 1 To 5, represented by Bracamontes, Michael R, Larsen, Timothy A., Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Ronald Evans Quidachay presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2011 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time1087 days |
This complaint document is a proof of service of summons and complaint in a legal case between Ethel H. Ross, as trustee of the Ethel Hill Ross, and Claude Alix Bertrani. The case number is CUD-11-635529, and the filing date is Feb-04-2011. The docum...
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND AWARDING SANCTIONS TO PLAINTIFF
Date: April 27, 2011DEMAND FOR JURY AND MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY DEFENDANT BERTRAND, CLAUDE ALIX
Date: February 23, 2011ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT
Date: January 25, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF ETHEL H. ROSS AS TRUSTEE OF THE ETHEL HILL ROSS 1998 TRUST
Date: September 18, 2013OPPOSITION TO PLTF'S MTN FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT BERTRAND, CLAUDE ALIX
Date: September 12, 2013OPPOSITION TO PLTF'S MTN FOR AN ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTY FILED BY DEFENDANT BERTRAND, CLAUDE ALIX
Date: September 12, 2013REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 20, 2013DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT BERTRAND, CLAUDE ALIX
Date: September 20, 2013ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTY
Date: October 18, 2013ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION OF RESCISSION OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: October 18, 2013EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER STAY OF EXECUTION FILED BY DEFENDANT BERTRAND, CLAUDE ALIX
Date: November 12, 2013ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: October 24, 2013ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BERTRAND, CLAUDE ALIX
Date: February 17, 2011ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CLAUDE-ALIX BERTRAND'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION
Date: November 12, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $1,029.00 RE 32185 FOR TRANSACTION W1513B12R008 (RENT DEPOSIT), PAYABLE TO ETHEL H ROSS AS TRUSTEE, DOC #1905753501, WARRANT #38203085, DATED DEC-26-2013 | |
December 04, 2013 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, SATISFIED AS TO REAL PROPERTY ONLY AS TO DEFENDANT BERTRAND, CLAUDE ALIX | |
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION FILED BY DEFENDANT BERTRAND, CLAUDE ALIX | |
November 12, 2013 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER STAY OF EXECUTION FILED BY DEFENDANT BERTRAND, CLAUDE ALIX | |
November 12, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT BERTRAND, CLAUDE ALIX | |
November 12, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CLAUDE-ALIX BERTRAND'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION | |
November 12, 2013 | Docket Event | RENT DEPOSIT DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT BERTRAND, CLAUDE ALIX | |
October 29, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE. $147.00 FILED BY PLAINTIFF ETHEL H. ROSS AS TRUSTEE OF THE ETHEL HILL ROSS 1998 TRUST | |
October 29, 2013 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT BERTRAND, CLAUDE ALIX |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.