Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sutton Funding Llc A Limited Liability Corporation, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Hall, Michael Carrillo, Houser, Eric D, against Does 1 To 30, Inclusive, Monroya, William, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Katherine Feinstein presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2010 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time54 days |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MONROYA, WILLIAM
Date: December 22, 2010MINUTE ORDER RE: DENYING SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY POSTING AND MAILING
Date: January 11, 2011NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: December 08, 2010DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY DEFENDANT MONROYA, WILLIAM
Date: December 22, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2011 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: KATHERINE FEINSTEIN |
|
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JAN-31-2011. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL REPRESENTED TO THE COURT THAT THE CASE SETTLED. JUDGE: KATHERINE FEINSTEIN; CLERK: E. BURA; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206) | |
January 18, 2011 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: KATHERINE FEINSTEIN |
|
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event | MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JAN-18-2011 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR JURY ON JAN-31-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 206 AT PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST. PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE. JUDGE: KATHERINE FEINSTEIN; CLERK: E. BURA; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206) | |
January 12, 2011 | Hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ELLEN CHAITIN |
|
January 12, 2011 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR JAN-12-2011 1:30 PM FOR DEPT 514 | |
January 12, 2011 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR JAN-12-2011 - CASE SETTLED PRIOR TO SETTLEMENT HEARING IN DEPT. 514. PARTIES WOULD LIKE TO KEEP TRIAL DATE OF 1-18-11. | |
January 11, 2011 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER RE: DENYING SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY POSTING AND MAILING | |
January 11, 2011 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUTTON FUNDING LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION SERVED JAN-07-2011, POSTING AND MAILING AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 30, INCLUSIVE | |
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL AND SETTLEMENT HEARING HEARING SET FOR JAN-12-2011 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 514 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.