Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Adams & Associates, Inc. Dba Adams & Associates Of, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Du, Miranda, against Does 1-20, Inclusive C Avenue Bldg. #, Gurdev Singh & Associates Dba Treasure Island Mini, Vazhappally, George, represented by Sacramento, Joseph Alcordo, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Peter J. Busch presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 12, 2010 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Commercial |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions37 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time111 days |
This complaint is a proof of service document related to a legal case. It provides information about the service of summons and other documents to the defendant, Gurdev Singh & Associates, dba Treasure Island Mini Mart & Deli. The document includes d...
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT VAZHAPPALLY, GEORGE (SUED HEREIN AS GURDEV SINGH)
Date: December 07, 2010DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: January 25, 2011NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: October 12, 2010DEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY DEFENDANT VAZHAPPALLY, GEORGE (SUED HEREIN AS GURDEV SINGH)
Date: December 07, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2011 | Hearing |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: PETER J. BUSCH |
|
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION, 301, NO APPEARANCES ON THIS MATTER. THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING AS FOLLOWS: DEFENDANT GEORGE VAZHAPPALLY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS OFF CALENDAR. ENTIRE CASE WAS DISMISSED ON JANUARY 25, 2011. JUDGE: PETER J. BUSCH, REPORTER: CAROL KAREN, CSR # 8189 (301/PJB) | |
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR JAN-31-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 301 | |
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $745.00 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE FEB-14-2011, FILED BY DEFENDANT VAZHAPPALLY, GEORGE (SUED HEREIN AS GURDEV SINGH) | |
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
January 12, 2011 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION, SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT VAZHAPPALLY, GEORGE (SUED HEREIN AS GURDEV SINGH) HEARING SET FOR JAN-31-2011 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 | |
December 07, 2010 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT VAZHAPPALLY, GEORGE (SUED HEREIN AS GURDEV SINGH) | |
December 07, 2010 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY DEFENDANT VAZHAPPALLY, GEORGE (SUED HEREIN AS GURDEV SINGH) | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY PLAINTIFF ADAMS & ASSOCIATES, INC. DBA ADAMS & ASSOCIATES OF NV, INC. | |
November 18, 2010 | Hearing |
DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Judge: PETER J. BUSCH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.