Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Herrera, Brenda, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Keith, Brenda Cruz, against Does 1 To 10, Flores, Oscar, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 17, 2009 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions146 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time410 days |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons document in a legal case filed by Brenda Herrera against Oscar Flores et al. The case number is CUD-09-631750 and the filing date is January 7, 2010. The document includes information about the attorney...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT FLORES, OSCAR | |
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT FLORES, OSCAR | |
May 28, 2010 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF HERRERA, BRENDA RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT FLORES, OSCAR THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: DEFENDANT VACATED ON 1/27/10, $3,786.51 RENT, $720.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $410.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $4,916.51, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
May 25, 2010 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE LEASE FOR REQUEST FOR AMENDED JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERRERA, BRENDA | |
May 12, 2010 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF HERRERA, BRENDA AS TO DEFENDANT FLORES, OSCAR | |
May 10, 2010 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN LIEU OF PERSONAL TESTIMONY; REQUEST FOR AMENDED JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERRERA, BRENDA | |
February 09, 2010 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, FULLY SATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT FLORES, OSCAR | |
January 11, 2010 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 1169 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF HERRERA, BRENDA RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT FLORES, OSCAR THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: 1725 CHESTNUT STREET, #1, SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94123, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
January 11, 2010 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: DAILY RENTAL VALUE $29.09 FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERRERA, BRENDA | |
January 11, 2010 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT FLORES, OSCAR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.