Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company As Trustee, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Partidge, William L, against Does 1 Thry X, Incl., Ruiz, Irene, Ruiz, Virginia, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with James J. McBride presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 01, 2009 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions58 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time75 days |
This complaint document is a proof of service of summons in an unlawful detainer case. The case number is CUD-09-629230 and it was filed on May 29, 2009. The plaintiff/petitioner is Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee, and the defendant/r...
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT RUIZ, VIRGINIA RUIZ, IRENE
Date: May 14, 2009NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: April 01, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2009 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: JAMES J. MCBRIDE |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JUN-15-2009. APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANT. NO OTHER APPEARANCES ON THIS MATTER. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED 5/29/09. JUDGE: JAMES MCBRIDE; CLERK: R. VELUZ; REPORTER: GISELLE CASEY, CSR# 8098 (206) | |
June 11, 2009 | Hearing | OTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |
June 11, 2009 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR JUN-11-2009 - NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF. TRIAL DATE MAINTAINED. (NOTE: DEFENDANT IS PRESENT WITH SPANISH-SPEAKING LIMITED SCOPE ATTY JEREMY REYES WHO WILL NOT BE AVAILABLE AT TRIAL CALL) | |
June 03, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR FIRST FRANKLIN MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2006-FF9, MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-FF9, ITS SUCCESSORS AND/OR ASSIGNS JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUN-15-2009 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 206 | |
June 03, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL AND SETTLEMENT HEARING HEARING SET FOR JUN-11-2009 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 218 | |
May 29, 2009 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
May 29, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR FIRST FRANKLIN MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2006-FF9, MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-FF9, ITS SUCCESSORS AND/OR ASSIGNS SERVED APR-30-2009, PRE-JUDGEMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 THRY X, INCL. | |
May 29, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 THRY X, INCL. | |
May 29, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE DAILY RENTAL VALUE:$30 FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR FIRST FRANKLIN MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2006-FF9, MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-FF9, ITS SUCCESSORS AND/OR ASSIGNS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.