Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Johnson, Charles, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Oler, Curtis Gilbert, against Does 1 To 10, Green, Glinda M, represented by Gold, Carolyn Ava, Halbany, Laurel, Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Charlotte W. Woolard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharlotte W. Woolard Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 26, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions48 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time545 days |
This complaint is an unlawful detainer case filed by Charles Johnson against Glinda M. Green. The case number is CUD-09-629198 and was filed on April 21, 2009. The plaintiff alleges that the defendant is in possession of the premises located at 1760 ...
ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON NOTICE OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT (TO BE SET FOR 10/26/09)
Date: October 19, 2009NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: March 26, 2009ORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: July 02, 2009ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 07, 2009ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GREEN, GLINDA M
Date: July 07, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF CHARLES JOHNSON'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO CCP 473(B) | |
February 02, 2010 | Tentative Ruling |
Notice Of Motion For Attorney'S Fees And Costs Set for hearing on Tuesday, February 2, 2010, line 10, PLAINTIFF CHARLES JOHNSON Motion For Attorney's Fees and Costs. Granted in part. Plaintiff is awar...
Judge: CHARLOTTE W. WOOLARD |
|
February 02, 2010 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion For Attorney'S Fees And Costs
Judge: CHARLOTTE W. WOOLARD |
|
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFF CHARLES JOHNSON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS. ARGUED AND THE COURT ADOPTED AND AMENDED ITS TENTATIVE RULING AS FOLLOWS: GRANTED IN PART. PLAINTIFF IS AWARDED $1,325.00 IN FEES AND COSTS FOR FILING MOTION AND APPEARING AT HEARING. DEFENDANT TO PAY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL WITHIN TEN BUSINESS DAYS. (PREVAILING PARTY TO PREPARE A FORM OF ORDER.) JUDGE: A. JAMES ROBERTSON; COURT REPORTER: KENT GUBBINE CSR # 5797 | |
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR FEB-02-2010 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
December 15, 2009 | Tentative Ruling |
Notice Of Motion For Attorney'S Fees And Costs Set for hearing on Tuesday, December 15, 2009, line 22, PLAINTIFF CHARLES JOHNSON Motion For Attorney's Fees and Costs. Continued to February 2, 2010 on ...
Judge: CHARLOTTE W. WOOLARD |
|
December 15, 2009 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion For Attorney'S Fees And Costs
Judge: CHARLOTTE W. WOOLARD |
|
December 15, 2009 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFF CHARLES JOHNSON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS CONTINUED FROM DEC-15-2009 TO LAW AND MOTION AT FEB-02-2010, 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 302. NO APPEARANCES ON THIS MATTER. THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING AS FOLLOWS: CONTINUED TO FEBRUARY 2, 2010 ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION. JUDGE: CHARLOTTE WALTER WOOLARD, REPORTER: ANN MENDOZA, CSR #6812 | |
December 15, 2009 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR DEC-15-2009 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
December 11, 2009 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO PLTF'S MTN FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS FILED BY DEFENDANT GREEN, GLINDA M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.