Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Hsbc Bank Usa Inc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Alvarado, Raymond G, against Does 1 Through 20,Inclusive, Mayfield, Thomas, Taylor, Lottie, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Paul H. Alvarado presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 06, 2008 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions47 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time362 days |
DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: August 03, 2009ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & APPLICATION
Date: September 05, 2008ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT LOTTIE TAYLOR'S REQUEST TO RE-ESTABLISH HER POSSESSION
Date: October 07, 2008NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: August 06, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2009 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
October 07, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT LOTTIE TAYLOR'S REQUEST TO RE-ESTABLISH HER POSSESSION | |
October 07, 2008 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER RESTORING HER TO POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES; STATEMENT OF FACTS, DECLARATION FILED BY DEFENDANT TAYLOR, LOTTIE | |
September 22, 2008 | Tentative Ruling |
DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT Set for hearing on Monday, September 22, 2008, line 14. DEFENDANT LOTTIE TAYLOR'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT is sustained. No opposition filed. Five days leave to amend. =(302/PHA)
Judge: PAUL H. ALVARADO |
|
September 22, 2008 | Hearing |
DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Judge: PAUL H. ALVARADO |
|
September 22, 2008 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR SEP-22-2008 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
September 22, 2008 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, NO OTHER APPEARANCES ON THIS MATTER. MR. RESNER REPORTED THAT AN OPPOSITION WAS MAILED TO THE COURT, BUT IT APPEARS IT HAD NOT YET BEEN RECEIVED. THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING AS FOLLOWS: DEFENDANT LOTTIE TAYLOR'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT IS SUSTAINED. NO OPPOSITION FILED. FIVE DAYS LEAVE TO AMEND. PREVAILING PARTY TO PREPARE A FORM OF ORDER. JUDGE: PAUL H. ALVARADO; REPORTER: MARIA TORREANO, CSR #8600 | |
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF LOTTIE TAYLOR; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MIGUEL DUARTE IN SUPPORT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA INC | |
September 05, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & APPLICATION | |
August 28, 2008 | Docket Event | FEE PAID: APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING FILED BY PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.