Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Community Housing Partnership, A California, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Rossoff, Michael Sherwood, against Brown, Aaron, Does 1-10, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Robert L. Dondero presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 01, 2007 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions46 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
VerdictPlaintiff |
Case Cycle Time49 days |
ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR IMMEDIATE STAY OF ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT
Date: December 28, 2007ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND STAY A120128 #2
Date: January 02, 2008REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, AS TO DEFENDANT BROWN, AARON
Date: November 15, 2007MINUTES FOR DEC-18-2007 2:00 PM FOR DEPT 501
Date: December 18, 2007ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON APPEAL
Date: February 06, 2008DEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY DEFENDANT BROWN, AARON
Date: November 21, 2007MINUTES FOR DEC-19-2007 8:30 AM FOR DEPT 501
Date: December 19, 2007REMITTITUR ISSUED
Date: March 24, 2008NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: November 01, 2007ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BROWN, AARON
Date: November 21, 2007ORDER DIMISSING APPEAL
Date: March 04, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2008 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR ISSUED | |
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER DIMISSING APPEAL | |
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event | APPELLATE COURT CALENDAR OF FEB-22-2008 - MOTION TO BE RELIEVED OF DEFAULT DENIED APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION. | |
February 22, 2008 | Hearing | Motion To Be Relieved Of Default | |
February 22, 2008 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR FEB-22-2008 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 509 | |
February 22, 2008 | Docket Event | APPELLATE COURT CALENDAR OF FEB-22-2008 - MOTION TO BE RELIEVED OF DEFAULT TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF FEB-22-2008 BY HON. ROBERT L. DONDERO, (ACTING)APPELLATE PRESIDING JUDGE. | |
February 06, 2008 | Docket Event | SET FOR APPELLATE CALENDAR FOR MOTION TO BE RELIEVED OF DEFAULT HEARING SET FOR FEB-22-2008 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 509 NOTICE SENT BY COURT | |
February 06, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON APPEAL | |
January 23, 2008 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY, POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, SATISFIED AS TO REAL PROPERTY ONLY AS TO DEFENDANT BROWN, AARON | |
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST CONTINUANCE FOR MOTION DEFAULT FILED BY DEFENDANT BROWN, AARON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.