Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Value Home Loan,Inc., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Brown Jr., John Clark, against Does 1 Through 10 Inclusive, Ellick, Eric, Perez, Sonya Renee Munoz, Webb, Mitchell, represented by Hodge, Sean P., Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Charlotte W. Woolard presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 11, 2007 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions232 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time1828 days |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT PEREZ, SONYA RENEE MUNOZ
Date: December 13, 2007NOTICE OF HEARING FOR COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL
Date: April 03, 2008MINUTES FOR APR-11-2008 2:00 PM FOR DEPT 502
Date: April 11, 2008MINUTES FOR FEB-14-2008 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 502
Date: February 14, 2008MINUTES FOR FEB-15-2008 8:30 AM FOR DEPT 502
Date: February 15, 2008ORDER AND STIPULATION RE: TRIAL EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS
Date: February 21, 2008MINUTES FOR FEB-13-2008 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 502
Date: February 13, 2008MINUTES FOR FEB-11-2008 10:15 AM FOR DEPT 502
Date: February 11, 2008ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT
Date: November 30, 2007NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: October 11, 2007MINUTES FOR JUL-02-2008 2:30 PM FOR DEPT 502
Date: July 02, 2008ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS
Date: May 13, 2008DEMAND FOR JURY AND MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY DEFENDANT PEREZ, SONYA RENEE MUNOZ
Date: December 13, 2007NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE OPENING BRIEF
Date: October 27, 2008ORDER RE: DIRECTED VERDICT
Date: February 15, 2008ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE
Date: March 18, 2008ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT SONYA RENEE MUNOZ PEREZ'S APPLICATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS
Date: March 07, 2008ORDER DENYING COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL
Date: June 30, 2008NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL
Date: July 16, 2008ORDER GRANTING COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL
Date: February 26, 2009REMITTITUR ISSUED
Date: March 18, 2009ORDER GRANTING PLAINITFF/RESPONDENT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE CORRECTED RECORD
Date: September 18, 2008MINUTE ORDER RE: DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SERVE BY POST AND MAIL
Date: November 13, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF VALUE HOME LOAN,INC. | |
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR ISSUED | |
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR FILED | |
February 26, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL | |
February 26, 2009 | Docket Event | APPELLATE COURT CALENDAR OF FEB-06-2009 - COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER | |
February 06, 2009 | Hearing | Court'S Motion To Dismiss Appeal | |
November 17, 2008 | Docket Event | SET FOR APPELLATE CALENDAR FOR COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL HEARING SET FOR FEB-06-2009 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 509 NOTICE SENT BY COURT | |
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE OPENING BRIEF | |
September 24, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE(O/B DUE 10/14/2008) | |
September 19, 2008 | Docket Event | RECORD ON APPEAL TRANSMITTED TO APPELLATE DEPT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.