Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
San Francisco Housing Authority, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Lee, Cindy, against Does 1-10 Inclusive, Mooring-Guard, Ulysses, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with David Ballati presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 07, 2007 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions3088 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time3088 days |
This complaint is a document related to a case in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The case number is CUD-07-621233 and it was filed on August 20, 2015. The plaintiff is the San Francisco Housing Authority and the defendant ...
DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT
Date: August 20, 2015ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MOORING-GUARD, ULYSSES
Date: March 13, 2007NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: March 07, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT | |
May 14, 2007 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: DAVID BALLATI |
|
May 10, 2007 | Hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SUE M. KAPLAN |
|
May 10, 2007 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR MAY-14-2007 - CASE SETTLED. | |
May 10, 2007 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR MAY-10-2007 - CASE SETTLED. | |
April 26, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY JURY TRIAL SET FOR MAY-14-2007 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 206 | |
April 26, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL AND SETTLEMENT HEARING HEARING SET FOR MAY-10-2007 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 218 | |
March 13, 2007 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MOORING-GUARD, ULYSSES | |
March 13, 2007 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY AND MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY DEFENDANT MOORING-GUARD, ULYSSES | |
March 13, 2007 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68511.3 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT MOORING-GUARD, ULYSSES ORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO CRC 3.50 - 3.63 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.