Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Luk, Sam, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Johnson, Anders L, against Collins, James, Does 1 To 20, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Ronald Evans Quidachay presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald Evans Quidachay Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2006 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions73 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time77 days |
2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUK, SAM AS TO DEFENDANT COLLINS, JAMES
Date: April 24, 2006NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: February 10, 2006ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT.
Date: April 24, 2006Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2006 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
April 25, 2006 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUK, SAM SERVED APR-24-2006, MAIL AS TO DEFENDANT COLLINS, JAMES | |
April 24, 2006 | Tentative Ruling |
DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON APRIL 24,2006 DEFENDANT JAMES COLLINS DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IS SUSTAINED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND PER PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST. =(302/REQ)
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
April 24, 2006 | Docket Event | 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUK, SAM AS TO DEFENDANT COLLINS, JAMES | |
April 24, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT. | |
April 24, 2006 | Hearing |
DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
April 24, 2006 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR APR-24-2006 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
April 24, 2006 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF LUK, SAM | |
April 24, 2006 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANT JAMES COLLINS; DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT. NO ARGUMENT AND THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING. SUSTAINED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND PER PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST. (302/REQ) BELDON YEE # 2647 | |
April 06, 2006 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUK, SAM AS TO DEFENDANT COLLINS, JAMES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.