Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Chiu, Handy, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Parkinson, Susan, against Chavez, Randy, Collins, James, Does 1-10, Inclusive, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2006 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time76 days |
ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT
Date: February 17, 2006NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: February 09, 2006Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2006 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, FULLY SATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT CHAVEZ, RANDY COLLINS, JAMES | |
March 13, 2006 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT CHAVEZ, RANDY COLLINS, JAMES | |
March 13, 2006 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF THE DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF THE PROPERTY LOCATED AT 149 PANAMA STREET, LOWER UNIT, S.F., CA 94132 WAS $52.50 FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHIU, HANDY | |
March 10, 2006 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 1169 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CHIU, HANDY RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT CHAVEZ, RANDY COLLINS, JAMES THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: 149 PANAMA ST. LOWER UNIT , S.F. CA. 94132, LEASE FORFEITED, AND ALL TENANTS, SUBTENANTS , NAMED CLAIMANTS , AND OTHER OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES PER CCP 415.46 . SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
March 10, 2006 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT CHAVEZ, RANDY COLLINS, JAMES | |
March 10, 2006 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN LIU OF PERSONAL TESTIMONY FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHIU, HANDY | |
March 10, 2006 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT PREJUDGMENT CLAIM, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHIU, HANDY SERVED FEB-22-2006, POSTING AND MAILING AS TO DEFENDANT CHAVEZ, RANDY COLLINS, JAMES DOES 1-10, INCLUSIVE | |
February 17, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT | |
February 14, 2006 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHIU, HANDY | |
February 09, 2006 | Docket Event | UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHIU, HANDY AS TO DEFENDANT CHAVEZ, RANDY COLLINS, JAMES DOES 1-10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.