Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
San Francisco Housing Authority, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Evje, Arnold Walter, against Does 1-10, Pasene, Tautalatasi, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Robert L. Dondero presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2005 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time83 days |
NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: March 04, 2005NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL SENT BY COURT
Date: May 16, 2005Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2005 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: ROBERT L. DONDERO |
|
May 26, 2005 | Hearing |
MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SUE M. KAPLAN |
|
May 26, 2005 | Docket Event | SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD, CASE SETTLED | |
May 26, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE NOTICE OF LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION UD SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, FILED BY TAUTALATASI PASENE, PAUL BEHREND ASSIGNED TO REPRESENT PARTY FOR UD SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. | |
May 26, 2005 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR MAY-31-2005 - CASE SETTLED. | |
May 26, 2005 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR MAY-26-2005 1:30 PM FOR DEPT 218 | |
May 16, 2005 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY SET FOR JURY TRIAL ON MAY-31-2005 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 206 NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL FILED | |
May 16, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT HEARING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAY-26-2005 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 218 | |
May 16, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL SENT BY COURT | |
March 23, 2005 | Docket Event | AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT PER ORDER DEFENDANT SUED INCORRECTLY AS TAUTALATASI, PASENE TO BE PASENE, TAUTALATASI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.