Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The John Stewart Company, Inc., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Zanghi, John P, against Does 1 To 5, Johnson, Gladys, represented by Prochovnick, Ora Shelee, Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Ronald Evans Quidachay presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2003 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT JOHNSON, GLADYS
Date: October 30, 2003ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO NOTICE MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT (TO BE SET FOR 10/28/03)
Date: October 21, 2003ORDER ENTERING JUDGMENT FOLLOWING DEFAULT UNDER TERMS OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (CCP 664.6)
Date: September 02, 2004ORDER TO VACATE & SET ASIDE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGT & TO RECALL WRIT OF EXECUTION
Date: October 28, 2003DEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY DEFENDANT JOHNSON, GLADYS
Date: October 30, 2003Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2004 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, SATISFIED AS TO REAL PROPERTY ONLY AS TO DEFENDANT JOHNSON, GLADYS | |
September 03, 2004 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE $6.16 FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE JOHN STEWART COMPANY, INC. | |
September 03, 2004 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT JOHNSON, GLADYS | |
September 02, 2004 | Tentative Ruling |
Notice Of Motion And Motin For Entry Of Judgment Pursuant To Terms Of Settlement Agreement (Ccp 664.6) GRANT- IF MOVING PARTY PRESENTS A TIMELY PROOF OF SERVICE, NO OPPOSITION FILED. OTHERWISE, OFF CA...
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
September 02, 2004 | Docket Event | ORDER ENTERING JUDGMENT FOLLOWING DEFAULT UNDER TERMS OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (CCP 664.6) | |
September 02, 2004 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF THE JOHN STEWART COMPANY, INC. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT JOHNSON, GLADYS THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: 120 CASHMERE #E, SAN FRANCISCO, CA. $707.70 RENT, $340.90 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $1,048.60, LEASE FORFEITED, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
September 02, 2004 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motin For Entry Of Judgment Pursuant To Terms Of Settlement Agreement (Ccp 664.6)
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
September 02, 2004 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR SEP-02-2004 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
September 02, 2004 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFF THE JOHN STEWART COMPANY, INC. MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO TERMS OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. APPEARANCES: PLAINTIFF. NO ARGUMENT, THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING --GRANT- VALID PROOF OF SERVICE PRESENTED IN OPEN COURT. NO OPPOSITION FILED. ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY REPORTER: BELDON YEE, CSR#2647. | |
August 10, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY ZANGHI, JOHN P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.