Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Crawley, John presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 28, 2009 |
CategoryGovernmental Complaint To Establish Child Sppt/Health Ins |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2013 | Hearing | Family Court Services Re: Comment FAMILY COURT SERVICES: APPOINTMENT 4/23/13 @ 8AM (FAMSS804872) | |
October 28, 2011 | Hearing | Family Court Services Re: Comment FAMILY COURT SERVICES: MEDIATION 01/20/2012 @ 1:00 PM (FAMSS804872) | |
October 28, 2011 | Hearing | Update Complaint of Comment UPDATE COMPLAINT OF FCS DESTRUCTION YEAR ADDED | |
January 21, 2011 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Crawley, John Comment MOTION RE: RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT(8/25/10) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED. (MODIFICATION GOVERNMENTAL) JOHN A CRAWLEY,COMMISSIONER CLERK: JANET DEAN BAILIFF: L HITCHCOCK NOT REPORTED - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY STEVEN PESANTE PRESENT FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION. ON GOVERNMENTAL COMPLAINT OF THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO, THE FOLLOWING PARTIES ARE PRESENT ABRAHAM A SOLORZANO. DEFENDANT SARA F OLIVA PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR MTN MODIFY CHILD SUPPORT FILED 8/25/10 BY DCSS. MODIFICATION HEARING HELD. AT THE REQUEST OF PARTIES THE COURT DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE THE MOTION TO MODIFY CHILD SUPPORT FILDED 8/25/10 BY DCSS. ALL EXISTING ORDERS SHALL REMAIN IN FULL FORCE AND EFFECT. === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
January 21, 2011 | Hearing | DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Modification Original Type DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Modification Judicial Officer Crawley, John Hearing Time 8:00 AM Result Held Comment MOTION RE: RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT(8/25/10) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED. (MODIFICATION GOVERNMENTAL) | |
November 16, 2010 | Hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE BY MAIL ON 11/15/10 AS TO SARA F OLIVA/ABRAHAM A SOLORZANO, FILED. (IMAGED) | |
October 18, 2010 | Hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF CONT TO 1/21/11 BY MAIL ON 10/15/10 AS TO ABRAHAM A. SOLORZANO, FILED. | |
October 18, 2010 | Hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF MOTION FILED 8/25/10,CONT TO 1/21 BY MAIL ON 10/15/10 AS TO SARA F. OLIVIA, FILED. (IMAGED) | |
October 15, 2010 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Crawley, John Comment MOTION RE: RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT(8/25/10) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED. (MODIFICATION GOVERNMENTAL) JOHN A CRAWLEY,COMMISSIONER CLERK: WIMALA BLANCHARD COURT REPORTER JULIE NAREZ-ARMBRUSTER;12512 BAILIFF: L HITCHCOCK - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY STEVEN PESANTE PRESENT FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: SARA F OLIVA, ABRAHAM A SOLORZANO - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR MODIFY CHILD SUPPT FILED 082510 BY DCSS. MODIFICATION HEARING HELD. HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF DCSS. REASON: TO EFFECT SERVICE ON MOTHER. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/21/11 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT CS1. MODIFY CHILD SUPPORT FILED 082510 BY DCSS NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY DCSS. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
October 15, 2010 | Hearing | DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Modification Original Type DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Modification Judicial Officer Crawley, John Hearing Time 8:00 AM Result Held Comment MOTION RE: RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT(8/25/10) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED. (MODIFICATION GOVERNMENTAL) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.