Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Fuertsch, Charles M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 28, 2009 |
CategoryGovernmental Complaint To Establish Child Sppt/Health Ins |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2013 | Hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED 070113 BY MAIL ON 08/05/13 AS TO MIRIAM ABREGO, FILED. | |
July 01, 2013 | Hearing | Order After Hearing Filed Comment ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED. HEARING DATE 06/26/13 IN DEPT CS2. | |
June 26, 2013 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Anderson, Diane I Comment MOTION RE: RE: SET ASIDE DEFAULT ORDER FILED 3-10-10(050713) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. (ENFORCEMENT GOVERNMENTAL) DIANE I ANDERSON,COMMISSIONER CLERK: JACQUELINE HOLT COURT REPORTER SHARON POSEY;12835 BAILIFF: JG MEDRANO - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY RALPH OH PRESENT FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MIRIAM ABREGO - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR MOTION RE SET ASIDE DEFAULT ORDER FILED 03/10/10. MOTION FILED 05/07/13 BY DCSS. OSC/MOTION HELD. THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO'S MOTION FILED 05/07/13 RE SET ASIDE DEFAULT ORDER IS GRANTED. THE COURT ORDERS SET ASIDE THE MONETARY PORTIONS OF THE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED ON 03/10/10. - THE COURT ORDERS AND REESTABLISHES CHILD SUPPORT AT ZERO COMMENCING 12/01/09 FOR THE MINOR CHILD NICHOLAS ABREGO DOB: 11/22/05. - IN THIS MATTER MOTHER IS THE OBLIGOR AND THE SUPPORT ORDER IS REESTABLISHED AT ZERO ON THE BASIS MOTHER IS CURRENTLY INCARCERATED AND IS SERVING AN APPROXIMATE SENTENCE OF 17 YEARS. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
June 26, 2013 | Hearing | DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Enforcement Original Type DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Enforcement Judicial Officer Anderson, Diane I Hearing Time 8:00 AM Result Held Comment MOTION RE: RE: SET ASIDE DEFAULT ORDER FILED 3-10-10(050713) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. (ENFORCEMENT GOVERNMENTAL) | |
May 07, 2013 | Hearing | Motion Filed Re: Comment MOTION RE: RE SET ASIDE DEFAULT ORDER FILED 3-10-10(050713) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED. (ENFORCEMENT GOVERNMENTAL) | |
March 29, 2010 | Hearing | Received Documents for Imaging Scanned Comment RECEIVED DOCUMENTS FOR IMAGING | |
March 29, 2010 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment and Proof of Service (Gov) Filed Comment NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (GOVERNMENTAL) FILED. | |
March 10, 2010 | Hearing | Declaration for Default or Uncontested Judgment Filed on Comment DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON MIRIAM ABREGO | |
March 10, 2010 | Hearing | Default Entered as to Comment DEFAULT ENTERED ON GOVERNMENTAL COMPLAINT OF THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO AS TO MIRIAM ABREGO. | |
March 10, 2010 | Hearing | Request to Enter Default Filed Comment REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MIRIAM ABREGO FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.