Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Fuertsch, Charles M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2009 |
CategoryGovernmental Complaint To Establish Child Sppt/Health Ins |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2019 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment OSC RE: RE: AFFIDAVIT FOR CONTMEMPT(072318) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. (ENFORCEMENT GOVERNMENTAL) | |
February 15, 2019 | Hearing | DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Enforcement Original Type DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Enforcement Hearing Time 8:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment OSC RE: RE: AFFIDAVIT FOR CONTMEMPT(072318) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. (ENFORCEMENT GOVERNMENTAL) | |
December 14, 2018 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Fuertsch, Charles M Comment OSC RE: RE: AFFIDAVIT FOR CONTMEMPT(072318) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. (ENFORCEMENT GOVERNMENTAL) CHARLES M FUERTSCH,COMMISSIONER CLERK: JACQUELINE HOLT COURT REPORTER SHARON POSEY;12835 BAILIFF: L MITCHELL - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY NOT PRESENT FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION. DEFENDANT ESTUARDO CABRERA PRESENT PARTIES NOT PRESENT: SELINA S PARTIDA - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR OSC RE AFFIDAVIT FOR CONTEMPT FILED 07/23/18. OSC FILED BY THE DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. ENFORCEMENT HEARING HELD. COUNSEL P CHUNG & IGNACIO, LL APPOINTED TO REPRESENT ESTUARDO CABRERA IN THE OSC RE CONTEMPT ACTION. ARRAIGNMENT ON THE OSC RE CONTEMPT IS CONTINUED. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/15/19 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT CS2. - 09:35 MATTER IS RECALLED: APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY ALAN SKIDMORE PRESENT FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION. ATTORNEY KELLY A BOKTOR PRESENT FOR ESTUARDO CABRERA. DEFENDANT ESTUARDO CABRERA PRESENT PARTIES NOT PRESENT: SELINA S PARTIDA - PROCEEDINGS: AT THE REQUEST OF THE DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES, THE COURT ORDERS, THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO'S OSC RE AFFIDAVIT FOR CONTEMPT FILED 07/23/18 DISMISSED. OSC IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE REASON: THE DEPARTMENT INDICATES THAT MR. CABRERA HAS COMMENCED MAKING PAYMENTS AND HE IS NOW EMPLOYED. - VACATE GOVHE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/15/19 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT CS2. - CHUNG & IGNACIO LLP IS RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR ESTUARDO CABRERA. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
December 14, 2018 | Hearing | DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Enforcement Original Type DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Enforcement Judicial Officer Fuertsch, Charles M Hearing Time 8:00 AM Result Held Comment OSC RE: RE: AFFIDAVIT FOR CONTMEMPT(072318) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. (ENFORCEMENT GOVERNMENTAL) | |
October 10, 2018 | Hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE HEARING 12/14/18 BY MAIL ON 10/09/18 AS TO ESTUARDO CABRERA/SELINA S PARTIDA, FILED. | |
October 09, 2018 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Fuertsch, Charles M Comment OSC RE: RE: AFFIDAVIT FOR CONTMEMPT(072318) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. (ENFORCEMENT GOVERNMENTAL) CHARLES M FUERTSCH,COMMISSIONER CLERK: CARNESHA BULLOCKS COURT REPORTER SHARON POSEY;12835 BAILIFF: JOHN DEEN - APPEARANCES: PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ESTUARDO CABRERA, SELINA S PARTIDA ATTORNEY RALPH OH PRESENT FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION. - PROCEEDINGS: ENFORCEMENT HEARING HELD. ACTION CAME ON FOR OSC RE AFFIDAVIT FOR CONTEMPT (7/23/18). HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. REASON: MATTER TO BE HEARD WITH OTHER MATTER ON CALENDAR - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/14/18 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT CS2. COUNSEL FOR DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES TO GIVE NOTICE. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
October 09, 2018 | Hearing | DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Enforcement Original Type DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Enforcement Judicial Officer Fuertsch, Charles M Hearing Time 8:00 AM Result Held Comment OSC RE: RE: AFFIDAVIT FOR CONTMEMPT(072318) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. (ENFORCEMENT GOVERNMENTAL) | |
July 23, 2018 | Hearing | Motion Filed Re: Comment OSC RE: RE AFFIDAVIT FOR CONTMEMPT(072318) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED. (ENFORCEMENT GOVERNMENTAL) | |
November 04, 2013 | Hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF OAH BY MAIL ON 10/31/13 AS TO ESTUARDO CABRERA & SELINA PARTIDA, FILED. | |
October 21, 2013 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Anderson, Diane I Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT(090413) BY SELINA S PARTIDA FILED. (MODIFICATION GOVERNMENTAL) DIANE I ANDERSON,COMMISSIONER CLERK: JACQUELINE HOLT COURT REPORTER SHARON POSEY;12835 BAILIFF: A SERRANO - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY VICTOR URSO PRESENT FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION. ON GOVERNMENTAL COMPLAINT OF THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO, THE FOLLOWING PARTIES ARE PRESENT SELINA S PARTIDA. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ESTUARDO CABRERA - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR REQUEST FORORDER RE MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT. RFO FILED 09/04/13 BY SELINA S PARTIDA. MODIFICATION HEARING HELD. SELINA S PARTIDA'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT FILED 09/04/13 IS GRANTED THE COURT ORDERS ESTUARDO CABRERA TO PAY AS AND FOR CHILD SUPPORT FOR A TOTAL OF $$184.00 PER MONTH, PAYABLEON THE 1ST DAY OF EACH MONTH COMMENCING 10/01/13 FOR CHILD DEVIN CABRERA DOB: 10/18/04 AND CONTINUING UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. SUPPORT FINDINGS ARE SET FORTH ON THE COMPUTER PRINTOUT ATTACHED. THIS IS A SUPPORT ORDER THAT FATHER IS UNDER AN OBLIGATION TO PAY. CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES IS ORDERED TO ENFORCE BY WAGE ASSIGNMENT, PURSUANT TO FC5230 WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO OTHER MEANS OF COLLECTION AND ENFORCEMENT PURSUANT TO RTC19271(E)(3). ALL PAYMENTS ORDERED HEREIN SHALL BE PAID THROUGH THE CA STATE DISBURSEMENT UNIT, PO BOX 989067,WEST SACRAMENTO, CA 95798-9067. - THE $184.00 SUPPORT ORDER IS THE LOW RANGE OF THE LOW AVERAGE INCOME RECOMMENDATION TO THE COURT. COURT FINDS THE LOW INCOME ADJUSTMENT APPLIES. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.