Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of San Bernardino, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dept Of Child Support Services, against Urizar, Santiago A, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Charles M Fuertsch presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 10, 2021 |
CategoryGovernmental Complaint To Establish Child Sppt/Health Ins |
Last RefreshedJune 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2023 |
Department S49 - Historic
Judge: Fuertsch, Charles M |
||
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by mail/OAH filed 04/24/23 |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing filed (Governmental) 04/13/23 S49 |
|
April 13, 2023 |
Department S49 - Historic
Judge: Fuertsch, Charles M |
||
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Advisement/Rights pursuant to FC section 4251(b) & (c) filed | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certified - Registered Interpreter The interpreter is certified or registered for the language to be interpreted. The interpreter s identification has been verified by the Court using an identification badge issued by the Judicial Council or other documentation accompanied by photo identification. The interpreter oath has been administered and/or placed on file with the court administrator. |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by mail / Responsive Declaration, I&E, Declaration |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration Filed | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration re: RFO filed by Santiago Urizar on 02/23/23 |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed Responsive declaration to rfo |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.