Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Anchor Realty, Inc., Nzerem, Chukuwemeka N, filed a(n) Money case against Anchor Realty, Inc., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarrett L. Wong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 24, 2023 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE THE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. THE REQUEST IS GRANTED.
Date: November 16, 2023ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE
Date: January 09, 2024ORDER REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM DEFENDANT DENIED**
Date: January 22, 2024SC-109(AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR) FILED BY DEFENDANT ANCHOR REALTY, INC.
Date: January 19, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: January 23, 2024REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM FILED BY DEFENDANT ANCHOR REALTY, INC.
Date: January 19, 2024DECLARATION RE:REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM FILED BY DEFENDANT ANCHOR REALTY, INC.
Date: January 19, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF JAN-23-2024 - CONTINUED TO JAN-23-2024 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 504 - NO STIP TO JUDGE PRO TEM | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT CROSS COMPLAINANT ANCHOR REALTY, INC. IS NOT OWED ANY MONEY BY CROSS DEFENDANT NZEREM, CHUKUWEMEKA N $855.32 SECURITY DEPOSIT SATISFIES THE RENT BOARD FEE AND THE HAULING AND DISPOSING FEES. DEFENDANT MAY DISPOSE OF PERSONAL PROPERTY (LAPTOPS AND WATCHES) PER PLAINTIFF'S CONSENT AND RELEASE IN OPEN COURT. STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS, SEE JUDGMENT ATTACHED | |
January 23, 2024 | Hearing |
DEFENDANT'S CLAIM
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
January 23, 2024 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: JUDGE PRO TEM |
|
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY DEFENDANT ANCHOR REALTY, INC. | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF NZEREM, CHUKUWEMEKA N IS NOT OWED ANY MONEY BY DEFENDANT ANCHOR REALTY, INC. STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS, SEE JUDGMENT ATTACHED DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS RECEIVED | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF JAN-23-2024 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF JAN-23-2024 BY GARRETT L. WONG. PLAINTIFF CHUKUWEMEKA NZEREM IS PRESENT. DEFENDANT ANCHOR REALTY, INC. IS REPRESENTED BY MARK CAMPANA ALSO PRESENT. DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS ARE RETAINED. JUDGE: GARRETT L. WONG, CLERK: K. SEPTIEN, NOT REPORTED, (504). | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF JAN-23-2024 - JUDGMENT. | |
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM DEFENDANT DENIED** |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.