Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Shorty, Lanee M, filed a(n) Money case against Chien, Jui Oar Hsi, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Sharon M. Reardon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 28, 2023 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2024 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: JUDGE PRO TEM |
|
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF DEC-18-2023 - CONTINUED FOR PROOF OF SERVICE TO FEB-26-2024 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 506. PLAINTIFF LANEE SHORTY IS PRESENT. DEFENDANT JUI OAR HSI CHIEN IS NOT PRESENT. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: SHARON READON; CLERK: D. CARTER. NOT REPORTED.(D506) | |
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RE; CONTINUANCE | |
December 18, 2023 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: JUDGE PRO TEM |
|
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE IN ATTEMPTING SERVICE SERVICE FEE $85. FILED BY PLAINTIFF SHORTY, LANEE M AS TO DEFENDANT CHIEN, JUI OAR HSI | |
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF NOV-01-2023 - CONTINUED FOR PROOF OF SERVICE TO DEC-18-2023 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 506. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF LANEE M. SHORTY ONLY. JUDGE PRO TEM: LAUREN SUJEETH, CLERK: M. GOODMAN, NOT REPORTED. (506/JPT) | |
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO CONTINUE FOR PROOF OF SERVICE TO 12/18/23 (MONDAY) 1:30PM (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS) | |
November 01, 2023 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: JUDGE PRO TEM |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $10,000.00 [FORM STAMPED: BY FAX] FILED BY SHORTY, LANEE M AS TO DEFENDANT CHIEN, JUI OAR HSI ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR NOV-01-2023 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SHORTY, LANEE M ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.