Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Galeano-Portillo, Gia, filed a(n) Money case against Galeano-Portillo, Gia, Shapiro, Mikhail, Shapiro, Mikhiel, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarrett L. Wong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2023 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: November 13, 2023ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE THE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. THE REQUEST IS GRANTED.
Date: September 05, 2023CASE_TRANSFERRED TO SUPERIOR COURT, RECORD TRANSFERRED
Date: December 15, 2023DECLARATION (TO UPDATE PLAINTIFF'S ADDRESS) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GALEANO-PORTILLO, GIA
Date: November 08, 2023SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE HEARING SET FOR JAN-25-2024 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 525
Date: December 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2024 | Hearing |
SMALL CLAIM APPEALS
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
January 25, 2024 | Hearing | SMALL CLAIM APPEALS | |
January 25, 2024 | Hearing |
SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL CALENDAR OF JAN-25-2024 TRANSFERRED FROM DEPT. 525 TO DEPT. 206 FOR REASSIGNMENT. (206) | |
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL CALENDAR OF JAN-25-2024 - CONTINUED TO FEB-15-2024 AT 11:00 AM IN DEPT. 504 BY COURT. JUDGE: GARRETT L. WONG, CLERK: K. SEPTIEN, NOT REPORTED, (504). | |
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | MISCELLANEOUS CIVIL SPECIAL SETTING CALENDAR OF JAN-25-2024 - ASSIGNED TO SMALL CLAIM APPEALS ON JAN-25-2024 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 504, JUDGE GARRETT WONG. (206) | |
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JAN-25-2024 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 504 | |
December 26, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE HEARING SET FOR JAN-25-2024 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 525 | |
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL APPEAL UNTIMELY FILED. FILED PUSUANT TO LITIGANT'S REQUEST FILED BY APPELLANT SHAPIRO, MIKHAIL MAILED TO RESPONDENT GALEANO-PORTILLO, GIA | |
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE_TRANSFERRED TO SUPERIOR COURT, RECORD TRANSFERRED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.