Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Un Po Pazzo Llc, Un Po Pazzo Llc C O Costamagna, filed a(n) Money case against Dorsia Provisions Inc., Un Po Pazzo Llc, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Curtis E.A. Karnow presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 25, 2023 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: August 09, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT DORSIA PROVISIONS INC. MAILED TO RESPONDENT UN PO PAZZO LLC
Date: September 08, 2023CASE_TRANSFERRED TO SUPERIOR COURT, RECORD AND EXHIBITS TRANSFERRED
Date: September 18, 2023TRANSMITTAL RECEIPT FILED (PLAINTIFF EXHIBITS TRANSFERRED FROM SMALL CLAIMS DIVISION)
Date: September 18, 2023SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE HEARING SET FOR OCT-19-2023 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 525
Date: September 18, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: October 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | RECORD REMANDED TO SMALL CLAIMS (PLAINTIFF EXHIBITS (2) RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS DIVISION) | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT APPELLANT DORSIA PROVISIONS INC. TAKE NOTHING FROM RESPONDENT UN PO PAZZO LLC SEE JUDGMENT ATTACHED PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS RECEIVED NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED | |
October 19, 2023 | Hearing |
SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
October 19, 2023 | Hearing |
SMALL CLAIM APPEALS
Judge: CURTIS KARNOW |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR OCT-19-2023 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 611 | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL CALENDAR OF OCT-19-2023 - HELD AND TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF OCT-19-2023 BY JUDGE CURTIS KARNOW. JUDGE: HONORABLE CURTIS E.A. KARNOW; CLERK: C. CHENG; REPORTER: NOT REPORTED; BAILIFF: NOT ASSIGNED. (611) | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL CALENDAR OF OCT-19-2023 - SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT REVERSED. DORSIA PROVISIONS, INC. DOES NOT OWE UN PO PAZZO LLC ANY MONEY. THE JUDGMENT ON APPEAL IS FINAL AND REPLACES THE SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT OF AUG-09-2023. JUDGE: HONORABLE CURTIS E.A. KARNOW; CLERK: C. CHENG; REPORTER: NOT REPORTED; BAILIFF: NOT ASSIGNED. (611) | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL CALENDAR OF OCT-19-2023 TRANSFERRED TO DEPT. 206 FOR REASSIGNMENT - NO JUDGE PRO TEM AVAILABLE. (206) | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | MISCELLANEOUS CIVIL SPECIAL SETTING CALENDAR OF OCT-19-2023 - SMALL CLAIM APPEALS ASSIGNED ON OCT-19-2023 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 611, JUDGE KARNOW. (206) | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.