Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Keller, Robert, filed a(n) Money case against Page, Jeannette, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarrett L. Wong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 13, 2023 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | REMARK:RETURN MAIL BY POST OFFICE JUN-14-2023 CONTINUE ORDER MAIL TO DEFENDANT(ENVOLOPE MARKED:RETURN TO SENDER INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS UNABLE TO FORWARD) | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF KELLER, ROBERT IS NOT OWED ANY MONEY BY DEFENDANT PAGE, JEANNETTE PLAINTIFF DID NOT PROVE HIS CLAIM FOR DAMAGES AS AGAINST HIS FORMER TENANT. STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF JUN-06-2023 - JUDGMENT. | |
June 06, 2023 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: JUDGE PRO TEM |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF JUN-06-2023 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF JUN-06-2023 BY JUDGE PRO TEM DAVID LAVINE. PLAINTIFF ROBERT KELLER IS PRESENT. DEFENDANT JEANNETTE PAGE IS PRESENT. PARTIES ORALLY STIPULATE TO ALLOW THE JUDGE PRO TEM TO HEAR THEIR CASE. HEARD WITH CASE CSM-23-866689. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE PRO TEM: DAVID LAVINE; CLERK: R. SAHATJIAN. NOT REPORTED.(D506) | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF JUN-01-2023 - CONTINUED TO BE HEARD AS A COUNTER CLAIM TO JUN-06-2023 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 506. PLAINTIFF ROBERT KELLER IS PRESENT. DEFENDANT JEANETTE PAGE IS NOT PRESENT. COURT FINDS DEFENDANT JEANNETTE PAGE HAS AN OPEN CASE FILED AGAINST THE PLAINTIFF IN SMALL CLAIMS CASE# CSM-23-866689 JEANNETTE PAGE V. ROBERT KELLER WHICH IS SET FOR HEARING ON JUNE-06-2023 AT 1:30 P.M. IN DEPT. 506. THE COURT ORDERS THIS CASE CONTINUED TO BE HEARD AS A COUNTER CLAIM TO JUN-06-2023 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 506. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: GARRETT L WONG; CLERK: D. AU. NOT REPORTED.(D506) | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER CASE CONTINUED TO BE HEARD AS A COUNTER CLAIM. (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS.) | |
June 01, 2023 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVICE FEE $97. SERVED APR-26-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT PAGE, JEANNETTE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.