Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Sevush, Tracy, Sevush, Will, filed a(n) Money case represented by Pro Per, Taleghani, Marianne S., against Kirk, Valerie, Sevush, Tracy, Sevush, Will, represented by Pro Per, Taleghani, Marianne S., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Curtis E.A. Karnow presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2023 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: July 03, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: September 07, 2023CASE_TRANSFERRED TO SUPERIOR COURT, RECORD AND EXHIBITS TRANSFERRED
Date: July 24, 2023MINUTES FOR SEP-07-2023 9:30 AM
Date: September 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | RECORD REMANDED TO SMALL CLAIMS (PLAINTIFF & DEFENDANT EXHIBITS RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS DIVISION. THE EXHIBITS SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT ARE FOR CASES# 866704 AND 866705) | |
September 07, 2023 | Hearing |
SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
September 07, 2023 | Hearing |
SMALL CLAIM APPEALS
Judge: CURTIS KARNOW |
|
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT RESPONDENT SEVUSH, WILL SEVUSH, TRACY RECOVER FROM APPELLANT KIRK, VALERIE $695.73 PRINCIPAL, $344.97 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $1,040.70 PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS RECEIVED NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | MINUTES FOR SEP-07-2023 9:30 AM | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL CALENDAR OF SEP-07-2023 - JUDGMENT ENTERED. | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL CALENDAR OF SEP-07-2023 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF SEP-07-2023 BY CURTIS KARNOW. TRIAL IS HELD IN OPEN COURT ON THE RECORD. PARTIES PRESENT ARE DEFENDANT VALERIE KIRK AND PLAINTIFFS TRACY SEVUSH AND WILL SEVUSH AS WELL AS COUNSEL FOR THE DEFENDANT MARRIANNE TALEGHANI. ALSO PRESENT IS COURT REPORTER CONNIE PARCHMAN CSR #6137 PARCHMAN1@GMAIL.COM 510.853.5260 | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | MISCELLANEOUS CIVIL SPECIAL SETTING CALENDAR OF SEP-07-2023 - ASSIGNED TO SMALL CLAIM APPEALS ON SEP-07-2023 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 611, JUDGE CURTIS KARNOW. (206) | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: TALEGHANI, MARIANNE S. SUBSTITUTED FOR PRO PER AS ATTORNEY FOR KIRK, VALERIE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.