Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Williams, Bianca, filed a(n) Money case represented by Pro Per, Rood, Hadley Elizabeth, against San Francisco Fire Department 698 -, Williams, Bianca, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarrett L. Wong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 09, 2022 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: April 06, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY RESPONDENT WILLIAMS, BIANCA
Date: March 30, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY RESPONDENT WILLIAMS, BIANCA
Date: March 27, 2023RESPONDENT'S PRETRIAL STATEMENT FILED BY RESPONDENT WILLIAMS, BIANCA
Date: March 27, 2023RESPONDENT'S EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY RESPONDENT WILLIAMS, BIANCA
Date: March 27, 2023CASE_TRANSFERRED TO SUPERIOR COURT, RECORD AND EXHIBITS TRANSFERRED
Date: March 02, 2023SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ISSUED TO BRANDON CHATHAM
Date: March 27, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: January 30, 2023SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ISSUED TO CHARLENE GANDY, SFHOT/HELUNA HEALTH
Date: March 27, 2023SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ISSUED TO ANITA MOHAN, HAVN COLLECTIVE
Date: March 27, 2023TRANSMITTAL RECEIPT FILED (PLAINTIFF EXHIBIT TRANSFERRED FROM SMALL CLAIMS DIVISION)
Date: March 02, 2023REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO FIRE DEPARTMENT
Date: January 17, 2023ORDER RE: REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM(DEFENDANT)**GRANTED**
Date: January 19, 2023RESPONDENT'S WITNESS LIST FILED BY RESPONDENT WILLIAMS, BIANCA
Date: March 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | RECORD REMANDED TO SMALL CLAIMS (PLAINTIFF EXHIBIT TRANSFERRED FROM SMALL CLAIMS DIVISION RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS DIVISION) | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT RESPONDENT WILLIAMS, BIANCA TAKE NOTHING FROM APPELLANT SAN FRANCISCO FIRE DEPARTMENT NO EXHIBITS FILED NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED | |
April 06, 2023 | Hearing | SMALL CLAIM APPEALS | |
April 06, 2023 | Hearing |
SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MISCELLANEOUS CIVIL SPECIAL SETTING CALENDAR OF APR-06-2023 - ASSIGNED TO SMALL CLAIM APPEALS ON APR-06-2023 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 504, JUDGE GARRETT WONG. (206) | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL CALENDAR OF APR-06-2023 - SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT REVERSED. SAN FRANCISCO FIRE DEPARTMENT DOES NOT OWE BIANCA WILLIAMS ANY MONEY. THE JUDGMENT ON APPEAL IS FINAL AND REPLACES THE SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT OF JAN-30-2023. EXHIBITS WILL BE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO CCP 1952. | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR APR-06-2023 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 504 | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL CALENDAR OF APR-06-2023 TRANSFERRED TO DEPT. 206 FOR REASSIGNMENT - NO JUDGE PRO TEM AVAILABLE. (206) | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY RESPONDENT WILLIAMS, BIANCA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.