Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Soldis, Joseph, filed a(n) Money case against United Airlines, Inc., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarrett L. Wong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 25, 2022 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
DECLARATION RE: REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM FILED BY PLAINTIFF SOLDIS, JOSEPH
Date: October 06, 2022REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM FILED BY PLAINTIFF SOLDIS, JOSEPH
Date: October 06, 2022ORDER RE: REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM(PLANTIFF)**GRANTED**
Date: October 13, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: November 03, 2022ORDER CASE CONTINUED PER REQUEST OF THE PLAINTIFF.(SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS.)
Date: August 24, 2022REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM FILED BY DEFENDANT UNITED AIRLINES, INC.
Date: July 27, 2022ORDER OF CONTINUANCE PER REQUEST OF THE DEFENDANT.
Date: July 22, 2022ORDER ON REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM(PLANTIFF)**DENIED** UNTIMELY
Date: October 07, 2022DECLARATION RE: REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM FILED BY PLAINTIFF SOLDIS, JOSEPH
Date: October 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF NOV-03-2022 - CONTINUED - TRANSFERRED FORTHWITH TO BE HEARD IN DEPT 504 BEFORE JUDGE WONG TO NOV-03-2022 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 504. PLAINTIFF JOSEPH SOLDIS IS PRESENT VIA ZOOM. DEFENDANT UNITED AIRLINES, INC. IS PRESENT VIA ZOOM, REPRESENTED BY JILL MOFFETT, CUSTOMER SERVICE MANAGER. CLERK: D. AU. NOT REPORTED. (D506) | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF SOLDIS, JOSEPH IS NOT OWED ANY MONEY BY DEFENDANT UNITED AIRLINES, INC. MATTER IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SEE ATTACHMENT A TO JUDGMENT. STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS RECEIVED | |
November 03, 2022 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: JUDGE PRO TEM |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR NOV-03-2022 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 504 | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF NOV-03-2022 - JUDGMENT. JUDGE: GARRETT L. WONG, CLERK: K. SEPTIEN, NOT REPORTED, (504). | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RE: REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM(PLANTIFF)**GRANTED** | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM FILED BY PLAINTIFF SOLDIS, JOSEPH | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM FILED BY PLAINTIFF SOLDIS, JOSEPH | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER CASE CONTINUED (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS.) PLAINTIFF WILL NOT ALLOW CASE TO BE HEARD BEFORE A JUDGE PRO TEM. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.