Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cherniy, Maryna, filed a(n) Money case against Berdichevsky, Mikhail, Cherniy, Maryna, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarrett L. Wong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 21, 2022 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: July 13, 2022TRANSMITTAL RECEIPT FILED (NO EXHIBITS TRANSFERRED FROM SMALL CLAIMS DIVISION)
Date: June 10, 2022CASE_TRANSFERRED TO SUPERIOR COURT, RECORD TRANSFERRED
Date: June 09, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: May 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | RECORD REMANDED TO SMALL CLAIMS (NO EXHIBITS RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS DIVISION) | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT APPELLANT BERDICHEVSKY, MIKHAIL TAKE NOTHING FROM RESPONDENT CHERNIY, MARYNA NO EXHIBITS FILED NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
July 13, 2022 | Hearing |
SMALL CLAIM APPEALS
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
July 13, 2022 | Hearing |
SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUL-13-2022 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 504 | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | MISCELLANEOUS CIVIL SPECIAL SETTING CALENDAR OF JUL-13-2022 - ASSIGNED TO SMALL CLAIM APPEALS ON JUL-13-2022 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 504, JUDGE GARRETT WONG. (206) | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL CALENDAR OF JUL-13-2022 - SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT REVERSED. MIKHAIL BERDICHEVSKY DOES NOT OWE MARYNA CHERNIY ANY MONEY. THE JUDGMENT ON APPEAL IS FINAL AND REPLACES THE SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT FILED MAY-11-2022. EXHIBITS WILL BE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO CCP 1952. | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL CALENDAR OF JUL-13-2022 TRANSFERRED TO DEPT. 206 FOR REASSIGNMENT - NO JUDGE PRO TEM AVAILABLE. (206) | |
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE HEARING SET FOR JUL-13-2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 525 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.