Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Aec, Aec Alarms, filed a(n) Money case against Yee,, Yee, Lily, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with A. James Robertson II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeA. James Robertson II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2019 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time378 days |
MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY LILY YEE ON JAN-27-2020 - DENIED.
Date: January 27, 2020AUTHORIZATION OF TIANA YEE (NIECE) TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT FILED BY DEFENDANT YEE, LILY
Date: September 04, 2019ORDER RE: CONTINUE FOR PROOF OF SERVICE. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS.
Date: March 13, 2019ORDER FOR MOTION TO VACATE DENIED. (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS.)
Date: January 28, 2020STIPULATION FOR CASE TO BE HEARD BY JUDGE PRO TEM. FILED BY AEC ALARMS
Date: July 24, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: July 29, 2019ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT
Date: January 10, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: December 17, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF AEC ALARMS AS TO DEFENDANT YEE, LILY | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR MOTION TO VACATE DENIED. (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS.) | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY LILY YEE ON JAN-27-2020 - DENIED. | |
January 27, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT
Judge: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT YEE, LILY HEARING SET FOR JAN-27-2020 AT 03:30 PM IN DEPT 506 | |
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF CLAIM AND ORDER AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIM - FEE FOR SERVICE $127.50 FILED BY PLAINTIFF AEC ALARMS SERVED SEP-30-2019, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE SEP-30-2019 AS TO DEFENDANT YEE, LILY | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | (SC-108) ANSWER TO REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF AEC ALARMS | |
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | (SC-108) REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT YEE, LILY | |
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF AEC ALARMS RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT YEE, LILY $2,059.96 PRINCIPAL, $65.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $2,124.96 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.