Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Paul, Meera, filed a(n) Money case against Dudum, J D, Robertshaw Dc, Richard, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with A. James Robertson II presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 18, 2018 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time568 days |
ORDER RE: CONTINUED PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS.
Date: February 21, 2019ORDER RE: CONTINUED FOR PROOF OF SERVICE (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS)
Date: August 09, 2018ORDER RE: CONTINUED FOR PROOF OF SERVICE (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS)
Date: June 25, 2018DECLARATION RE: SUMMONS: COMPLAINT/CAUSES OF ACTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAUL, MEERA
Date: October 23, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: August 12, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS FROM EXHIBIT REPORT DATED NOV-01-2019 ORDERED DESTROYED | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF PAUL, MEERA IS NOT OWED ANY MONEY BY DEFENDANT ROBERTSHAW DC, RICHARD DUDUM, J D CONTRA COSTA SUPERIOR COURT DISMISSED PLAINTIFF COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO AMEND AFTER DEMUR WAS SUSTAINED TO COMPLAINT AGAINST BOTH DEFENDANTS. MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 473 WAS DENIED. THE COURT CANNOT HEAR EVIDENCE FROM PLAINTIFF BECAUSE OF RULING. STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS RECEIVED | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF AUG-08-2019 - JUDGMENT. | |
August 08, 2019 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF AUG-08-2019 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF AUG-08-2019 BY A. JAMES ROBERTSON II. PLAINTIFF MEERA PAUL IS PRESENT. DEFENDANT RICHARD ROBERTSHAW IS PRESENT. DEFENDANT JD DUNDUM IS PRESENT. PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II; CLERK: R. SAHATJIAN. NOT REPORTED.(506) | |
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAUL, MEERA ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 | |
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES (25 PAGE) PAID BY PLAINTIFF PAUL, MEERA | |
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER RE: CONTINUED PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS. | |
February 21, 2019 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.