Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ochoa, Damian R, filed a(n) Money case against Gavin, Mercedes A, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Cecilia P. Castellanos presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 02, 2017 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedSeptember 02, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions118 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time118 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERS DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFF DAMIAN OCHOA IS NOT PRESENT. DEFENDANT MERCEDES GAVIN IS PRESENT. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: CECILIA P. CASTELLANOS; CLERK: G. FELICIANO; NOT REPORTED. 506 | |
February 28, 2018 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: VISITING JUDGE |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER RE: DISMISSED W/O PREJUDICE (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF DEC-20-2017 - CONTINUED PER STIPULATION OF ALL PARTIES TO FEB-28-2018 AT 3:30 PM IN DEPT. 506. PLAINTIFF WAS PRESENT. DEFENDANT WAS PRESENT. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE PRO TEM: MICHELE MCGILL; CLERK: J. BERTELSEN; NOT REPORTED. (506) | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FEE FOR SERVICE: $0 SERVED NOV-02-2017, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT GAVIN, MERCEDES A | |
December 20, 2017 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: JUDGE PRO TEM |
|
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event | REMARK: MAIL RECEIVED AFTER COURT'S ORDER OF 11/20/17. FILED ANSWER TO SC-105 REQUEST BY DAMIAN R. OCHOA, POSTMARKED 11/25/17. | |
November 20, 2017 | Docket Event | (SC-105A) ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER (SMALL CLAIMS): THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDERS: [X] THE REQUEST IS DENIED. [X]EXPLANATION FOR DECISION: A FULL AIRING OF THE EVIDENCE WILL TAKE PLACE AT TRIAL. | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | (SC-105) REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY DEFENDANT GAVIN, MERCEDES A | |
November 02, 2017 | Docket Event | MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $10,000.00 FILED BY OCHOA, DAMIAN R AS TO DEFENDANT GAVIN, MERCEDES A ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR DEC-20-2017 AT 03:30 PM IN DEPT 506 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.