Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wang, Daniel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Leichty, Calvin N, Leichty, Kristin Michelle, Leichty, Mary, Office Of The Director, D.M.V., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Donald S. Mitchell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald S. Mitchell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 22, 2017 |
CategoryAuto Accident |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Cycle Time99 days |
ORDER (SC-152) ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL: THE REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL IS APPROVED
Date: August 03, 2017REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY DEFENDANT LEICHTY, KRISTIN MICHELLE
Date: August 02, 2017ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL
Date: August 18, 2017NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: September 07, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, AS TO DEFENDANT LEICHTY, KRISTIN MICHELLE LEICHTY, MARY LEICHTY, CALVIN N | |
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event | THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF WANG, DANIEL RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT LEICHTY, KRISTIN MICHELLE LEICHTY, MARY LEICHTY, CALVIN N $1,263.72 PRINCIPAL, $45.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $1,308.72 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED | |
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF SEP-06-2017 - JUDGMENT. | |
September 06, 2017 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: DONALD S. MITCHELL |
|
September 06, 2017 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF SEP-06-2017 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF SEP-06-2017 BY DONALD S. MITCHELL. PLAINITFF DANIEL WANG IS PRESENT. DEFENDANT KRISTIN LEICHTY IS PRESENT. DEFENDANTS MARY LEICHTY AND CALVIN LEICHTY ARE NOT PRESENT. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL; CLERK: J. MURPHY; NOT REPORTED. (506) | |
August 31, 2017 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: DONALD S. MITCHELL |
|
August 22, 2017 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: DONALD S. MITCHELL |
|
August 18, 2017 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF AUG-31-2017 - CONTINUED PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF TO SEP-06-2017 AT 3:30 PM IN DEPT. 506 | |
August 18, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.